Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Child's Access to Firearms - Penalty
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the penalty for storing or leaving a loaded firearm in a location where the person knew or should have known that an unsupervised child would gain access to the firearm.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0655
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM