Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Lee, Manno, Montgomery, and Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing requirements for the form and content of specified livestock production contracts; requiring livestock production contracts to be reviewed by the Attorney General; establishing that contract producers have specified rights; prohibiting specified contractors from engaging in or allowing their employees or agents to engage in specified practices; establishing specified civil and criminal penalties for violation of the Act; providing for enforcement of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1019
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. Finance)
Senate 3/30/2015 3/30/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-101 through 24-902 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM