Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Handguns - School Employees - Handgun Permits and Carrying Weapons on School Property
Sponsored by
Senators Jacobs, Brinkley, Colburn, Glassman, Pipkin, and Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board to authorize school employees in the county board's school system to carry a handgun on school property under certain circumstances; requiring the Secretary of State Police to issue a handgun permit to a person who is otherwise qualified and who is a school employee in a school system in which the county board has authorized school employees to carry a handgun; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0436
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-102 )
(   3-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM