Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - State Grant to Counties With Small and Declining Student Enrollment
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Hershey, Brinkley, Getty, and Kittleman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing eligibility for a county board of education to receive a specified State grant; requiring a specified grant to be provided to eligible county boards in fiscal years 2015 through 2017 if the full-time enrollment is less than 5,000, less in the current fiscal year than in the prior fiscal year, and total direct education aid in the current fiscal year is less than the prior fiscal year by more than 1%; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the impact of declining enrollment on small school districts be reviewed; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0814
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {529231/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {305268/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments {529231/1 Report Adopted 41A
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41A
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 43
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations 46
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {305268/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM