Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Disabled Individuals - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Montgomery, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that any student financial aid, other than a student loan, received by a specified disabled student must be applied first to pay the student's tuition prior to receiving an exemption from the payment of tuition at community colleges; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0152
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/24/2015 3/22/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 52
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM