Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Perpetual Care Trust Funds - Report Submission Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from 120 to 150 days the time period within which a sole proprietor registered cemeterian, specified permit holders, or specified other persons subject to specified perpetual care trust requirements are required to submit a specified report regarding a specified perpetual care trust fund to the Director of the Office of Cemetery Oversight.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0555
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 38
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 55
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-603, 5-606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM