Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grant Distribution
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that 10% of the local impact grants provided to Prince George's County from proceeds of video lottery terminals is to be distributed to the Town of Forest Heights as enacted by Chapter 1 of the Acts of the 2012 Second Special Session.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM