Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of Proceeds
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the awarding of an additional video lottery operation license for a facility in Charles County in a vessel on the Potomac River; specifying that specified proceeds from video lottery terminals and table games at the facility be paid to the Governor Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge Fund; submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0647
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 18
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-05, 9-1A-24, 9-1A-27, 9-1A-30.1, 9-1A-36 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM