Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Carrying Proof of Coverage - Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement Fund
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Reilly, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, and Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an insurer to provide a specified insurance identification card to specified insureds at specified times; providing that an insurance identification card may be produced in a specified electronic format; requiring a specified operator to be in possession of evidence of required security; requiring that a specified operator is subject to a fine of $50 under specified circumstances; establishing the Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement Fund; exempting the fund from a specified provision of law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0720
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {237377/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {237377/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 52
House 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-503.1 )
(   17-104.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM