Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - Positions
Sponsored by
Baltimore City Senators
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Baltimore City Sheriff to establish a pay scale under specified circumstances; authorizing the Sheriff of Baltimore City to appoint an information technology specialist to the rank of captain to assess and manage the technology needs of the Sheriff's Office; authorizing the Sheriff of Baltimore City to appoint a chief financial officer to the rank of major to manage the budget, grants, and revenue of the Office; providing each deputy sheriff may receive an expense allowance of not more than $200 annually for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0671
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - Positions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {288576/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - Positions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - Positions
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {288576/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - Positions
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM