Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Unauthorized Computer Access for Sabotage - Water
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Feldman, Guzzone, Manno, and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from intentionally and willfully taking specified actions relating to unauthorized access to computer services with the intent to interrupt or impair the functioning of a service, device, or system related to the production, transmission, delivery, or storage of water in the State that is owned, operated, or controlled by a person other than a specified public service company; and providing penalties for a violation of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM