Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Physicians and the related allied health advisory committees in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) by extending the related termination provisions to July 1, 2023; altering the circumstances under which the State Board of Physicians may renew or reinstate a license to practice medicine; requiring a disciplinary panel, before any action is taken, to give an individual an opportunity for a hearing before a hearing officer; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1265
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {124339/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {296680/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {466085/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {124339/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 46
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {296680/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Floor Committee Amendment {466085/1 Adopted 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Text - Chapter - State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-212, 12-6A-03, 14-101, 14-205, 14-205.1, 14-205.2, 14-206, 14-302, 14-302.1, 14-316, 14-401.1, 14-405, 14-411.1, 14-413, 14-414, 14-5A-13, 14-5A-17, 14-5A-23, 14-5A-25, 14-5B-12, 14-5B-14, 14-5B-21, 14-5C-14, 14-5C-14.1, 14-5C-17, 14-5C-25, 14-5D-12, 14-5D-14, 14-5D-18, 14-5D-20, 14-5E-13, 14-5E-16, 14-5E-23, 14-5E-25, 14-5F-15, 14-5F-15.1, 14-5F-18, 14-5F-25, 14-5F-29, 14-5F-32, 14-606, 14-702, 15-307, 15-311, 15-313, 15-315, 15-502 )
(   1988, 1992, 1994, 2007 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM