Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Disciplinary and Licensure Procedures - Revision
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the continuing education requirements allow a specified licensee to receive up to a specified number of credit hours for providing specified services; requiring that the factual findings of a hearing officer under a specified provision of law be supported by clear and convincing evidence, rather than by a preponderance of the evidence; authorizing a licensee whose license has been summarily suspended by the State Board of Physicians to elect to have a hearing officer make specified final findings; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0899
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2013 3/27/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-316, 14-405, 14-406, 14-408, 14-409.1, 14-5A-17.1, 14-5B-14.1, 14-5D-15, 14-5E-17, 15-313, 15-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM