Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing references to the terms "child custody" and "visitation" in specified instances and substituting the terms "legal decision making" and "parenting time" in specified instances; requiring the court, in determining the appropriate allocation of legal decision making or parenting time between the parties, to consider specified factors; authorizing the court to consider specified factors; specifying that specified factors are not relevant, except under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1083
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203, 9-101, 9-101.1, 9-101.2, 9-102, 9-103, 9-104, 9-105, 9-106, 9-107, 9-108, 9-201 through 9-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM