Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Guzzone, Smith, Waldstreicher, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a judicial officer to consider the recommendation of a certain pretrial release services program in making a certain determination; requiring a court or District Court commissioner to consider including certain no-contact provisions as a condition of pretrial release if a certain pretrial release services program has made a certain request; requiring a certain pretrial release services program to notify the court on receipt of certain information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0263
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0766 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019, October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 11-104, 11-106, 11-914, 5-103, 5-201, 5-213 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM