Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Valuation of Real Property - Internet Database
Sponsored by
Senator Glassman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation maintain a database, available to the public on the Department's Web site, that relates to the valuation of specified real property in the State and includes specified information about each property; requiring the Department to maintain a database, available to the public on the Department's Web site, of assessment worksheets and cards that relate to the valuation of real property in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1041
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/11/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM