Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Benson, Conway, Feldman, Ferguson, Forehand, Gladden, Jones-Rodwell, King, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Peters, Pinsky, Raskin, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that when an individual becomes eligible for release from State or local custody, a law enforcement or any other government official may not continue to detain the individual on the basis of an immigration detainer; providing that a detainee may not be denied bail solely because of an immigration detainer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0029
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM