Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts
Sponsored by
Senators Garagiola, Manno, Benson, Forehand, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Montgomery, Peters, Ramirez, Rosapepe, and Stone
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified individuals performing work on public work projects to complete construction safety training; requiring contractors, before beginning work on a public work contract, to provide a certification to a public body indicating that each individual working on the site has completed the construction safety training course within the past 5 years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0330
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1330 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-801 through 17-808 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM