Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Safe Neighborhoods Act
Sponsored by
Senators Hough and Cassilly
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Reducing the notice period from 14 days to 7 days before a landlord may file an action to evict a tenant for a breach of the lease that involves certain dangerous behavior; altering the requirements for the written notice that a landlord must give before the landlord may file a certain complaint to evict a tenant for a breach of a lease that involves certain dangerous behavior; reducing the amount of time after entry of a certain judgment during which a certain party may appeal to the circuit court in a certain eviction proceeding; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0494
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Safe Neighborhoods Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {858472/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {493521/1 (Senator Manno) Rejected
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {443122/3 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {693422/1 (Senator Ferguson) Rejected (11-30)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {823227/1 (Senator Kagan) Rejected (11-29)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Safe Neighborhoods Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (26-21)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {360212/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Safe Neighborhoods Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {858472/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {493521/1 (Senator Manno) Rejected 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {443122/3 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {693422/1 (Senator Ferguson) Rejected (11-30) 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {823227/1 (Senator Kagan) Rejected (11-29) 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Safe Neighborhoods Act
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (26-21) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 50
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {360212/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Beidle) Adopted 63
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-402.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM