Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Kagan, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a manufacturer to make specified payments to dealers relating to benefits, incentives, and rebates; prohibiting manufacturers, distributors, and factory branches from taking specified coercive, punitive, and retaliatory actions against dealers; altering requirements relating to the transfer of franchises and the payment of claims made by dealers; increasing from $50,000 to $500,000 the maximum fine for specified violations committed by manufacturers, distributors, and factory branches; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0833
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-207, 15-207.1, 15-210, 15-211, 15-212, 15-213 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM