Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zones
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Benson, Currie, Edwards, Guzzone, Jennings, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Peters, and Raskin
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified eligibility criteria for specified credits under the One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit to include specified persons who establish or expand a business facility located in specified areas that, for business incubators, creates a specified aggregate number of qualified positions at the facility under specified circumstances; authorizing specified business incubators to claim a refund of specified project tax credits or start-up tax credits in specified taxable years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {439833/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments {439833/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-401, 6-402, 6-403, 6-404, 6-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM