Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Sponsored by
Senators Patterson, Augustine, Benson, Lee, Peters, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring at least $120,000 of $1,000,000 in impact grants distributed to Prince George's County from certain proceeds of video lottery terminals to be distributed to the Town of Forest Heights.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0458
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM