Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration and Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services - Military Families
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Astle, Cassilly, DeGrange, Klausmeier, Mathias, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that specified dependents who are determined eligible to receive services from the Developmental Disabilities Administration shall retain eligibility for the services under specified circumstances; requiring the Administration to allow specified dependents to remain on a specified waiting list under specified circumstances; requiring the Administration to reinstate specified services for specified dependents under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {857077/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {857077/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 45
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-134.1, 7-404.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM