Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Representation
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, if a minor, an incapacitated, unborn, or unknown individual, or an individual whose location is unknown and not reasonably ascertainable is not otherwise represented under a specified provision of law relating to specified trusts, a grandparent or more remote ancestor may represent and bind that individual in specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 67
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed 70
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 71
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14.5-303, 14.5-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM