Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Rosapepe, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, Zirkin, Zucker, and Oaks
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission to monitor and assess the impact of potential and actual federal changes to specified health care programs and to provide recommendations for State and local action to protect the access of residents of the State to affordable health coverage; providing for the composition of the Commission; authorizing the Commission to convene specified workgroups; requiring the Commission to report annually to the Governor and General Assembly by December 31; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0909
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {177871/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {263327/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-33)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {683229/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {243121/3 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {436189/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {466780/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {123324/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected (52-85)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-47)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {177871/1 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Committee Amendment Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Floor Amendment {263327/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-33) 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Floor Amendment {683229/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Floor Amendment {243121/3 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 47
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 52
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {436189/1 Adopted 55
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Floor Committee Amendment {466780/1 Adopted 55
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Floor Amendment {123324/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected (52-85) 56
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 56
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (90-47) 56
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
Post Passage 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM