Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Code Simplification and Clarification
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that specified references to individual retirement accounts include traditional and Roth individual retirement accounts; clarifying that a member of the Employees' Pension System who resumes employment before a specified date may resume participation in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection if the employer participates in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection; providing that specified retirees of the Judges' Retirement System are exempt from a specified reemployment earnings limitation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0612
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014, January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {779332/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Griffith) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Griffith) {653429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {779332/1 Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 First Reading Appropriations 37
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Griffith) Adopted 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Griffith) {653429/1 Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-601, 21-602, 22-215, 22-217, 23-213, 23-215.1, 23-225, 23-308, 24-206, 24-401.1, 25-204, 26-205, 26-401.1, 27-406, 28-205, 28-402, 29-302, 29-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM