Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Penalty for Failure to Submit Certification
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the amount a local school system or the Maryland School for the Deaf must pay as a penalty for failing to submit to the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System and the State Department of Education within a specified period of time a specified certification regarding specified retirees of the Teachers' Retirement System or the Teachers' Pension System who are employed by a local school system or the Maryland School for the Deaf and are exempt from a specified retirement allowance offset.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0630
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Second Reading Passed 23
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading Appropriations 28
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM