Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a fiscal note for a bill to include a criminal justice policy impact statement if the bill creates a criminal offense, significantly alters the elements of an existing criminal offense, alters the penalties applicable to a criminal offense, or changes existing sentencing, parole, or probation procedures; requiring the Department of Legislative Services to prepare the criminal justice policy impact statement by requesting information from specified entities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0168
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0478 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM