Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Firearms - Liability Insurance Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin and Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a person who possesses a firearm to maintain liability insurance that provides coverage of at least $250,000 for accidental injuries caused by the firearm; requiring a person who sells, rents, or transfers a firearm to verify that the purchaser, lessee, or transferee has specified liability insurance; establishing specified penalties for a violation of the Act; requiring a person who possesses a firearm before the effective date of the Act to comply with the requirements of the Act on or before January 1, 2014; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601, 5-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM