Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Prohibited Acts - Defense to Prosecution for Sale to Underage Individuals
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Kasemeyer, and Klausmeier
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Modifying certain elements required to establish a defense to serving an alcoholic beverage to an underage individual; and providing that reliance by an establishment or a seller on a certain type of identification scan fulfills an element of a certain defense.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {138772/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Prohibited Acts - Defense to Prosecution for Sale to Underage Individuals
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2018 2/09/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {138772/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Prohibited Acts - Defense to Prosecution for Sale to Underage Individuals
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM