Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Robotics Grant Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 681
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Robotics Grant Program to provide grants to public schools in the State to support and expand existing robotics programs; establishing eligibility requirements for the Program; requiring the Governor to include in the State budget an appropriation of at least $250,000 to the Program; requiring the State Department of Education to implement and administer the Program; and authorizing the Department to adopt specified regulations.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0115
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {334137/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-8)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-10)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 681
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {334137/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (37-8) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (128-10) 61
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 681
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM