Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain transferee of a Class B-D-7 license to apply to the Board of License Commissioners to exchange the license for a Class A-7 license under certain circumstances; establishing an Inner Harbor Park license; authorizing the Board to issue no more than two licenses to a nonprofit organization that is operated to promote and care for the Inner Harbor waterfront; authorizing the holder of a public market license to designate a vendor to sell certain alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption at a certain restaurant; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0637
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284037/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {183120/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263391/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {284037/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Floor Amendment {183120/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Economic Matters 50
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {263391/1 Adopted 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1001.2, 12-1002.1, 12-102, 12-1603, 12-1604, 12-404, 12-902.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM