Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
Sponsored by
Senator Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 295
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the limit on the number of call centers that may be approved by 2-1-1 Maryland to provide certain services; repealing certain provisions of law establishing and governing the Health and Human Services Referral Board in the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the Department to conduct a cost analysis that includes a determination regarding the amount of funding needed to support certain 2-1-1 services and to report the findings to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0669
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {587978/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 295
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {587978/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 295
Text - Chapter - Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
(   24-1201 through 24-1203, 24-1204, 24-1205, 24-1206 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:12 PM
Click to return on the top page