Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship
Sponsored by
Senators Garagiola, Astle, Benson, Brinkley, Brochin, Colburn, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Dyson, Edwards, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Getty, Gladden, Glassman, Jacobs, Jennings, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pipkin, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Reilly, Robey, Rosapepe, Shank, Simonaire, Stone, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a specified tuition reimbursement program and establishing the Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship; establishing eligibility requirements; requiring scholarship recipients to repay funds to the Maryland Higher Education Commission under specified circumstances; authorizing that the annual amount of the scholarship may be up to 100% of the equivalent tuition and mandatory fees of a resident undergraduate student at a specified 4-year public institution of higher education; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013, October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {724136/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {265761/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {724136/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/21/2013 3/21/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {265761/2 Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-101, 18-103, 18-603, 18-603.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM