Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a motor vehicle manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from committing specified acts relating to motor vehicle pricing; requiring a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch to ensure that any advertisement it directs to consumers relating to rebate and sales incentive claims meets specified requirements; prohibiting a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from taking specified punitive or retaliatory actions against specified persons; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0568
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Reassigned to Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Reassigned to Finance and Judicial Proceedings 20
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4101 through 14-4107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM