Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income - Individuals at Least 65 Years Old
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Peters, Astle, Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, Currie, DeGrange, Manno, McFadden, and Muse
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from $5,000 to $10,000 a subtraction modification under the State income tax for specified military retirement income for individuals who are at least 65 years old on the last day of the taxable year; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0482
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
18A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {919632/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted 18A
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments {919632/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 66
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 72
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM