Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Commemorative Months - American Indian Heritage Month
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim November as American Indian Heritage Month; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe the month with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0040
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {104536/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {104536/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM