Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax Checkoff
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Brochin, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Norman, Raskin, Ready, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to establish a checkoff on the individual income tax return through which specified individuals may make a contribution, not exceeding $500, to the Fair Campaign Financing Fund; providing that specified fines and penalties be deposited in the Fund; requiring the Comptroller to take specified actions to administer the checkoff; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0485
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
18A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted 18A
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM