Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Restrictions on Income-Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Review
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Colburn, Currie, DeGrange, Edwards, Getty, King, McFadden, and Robey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to provide a copy of rent-control legislation to the Department of Legislative Services prior to enacting the legislation; requiring the Department to prepare a fiscal note and economic impact analysis for the legislation within 30 days; requiring a copy of the fiscal note and economic impact analysis to be provided to specified persons; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0790
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Reassigned to Senate Rules
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Reassigned to Senate Rules 17
Senate 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM