Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Klausmeier, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified public charter schools to take specified steps to maintain a specified ratio as part of the initial cohort of students in a grade; authorizing specified public charter schools to give specified students a greater weight to the student's lottery status as part of the public charter school's admissions lottery; authorizing a county board to consider specified issues relating to school site and school building utilization when authorizing specified public charter schools to occupy specified sites or buildings; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0486
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
18A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {794139/1
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {794139/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {535864/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-7)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted 18A
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {794139/1 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Laid Over (Senator Kelley) Adopted 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {794139/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 57
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/08/2015 4/08/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/08/2015 4/08/2015 Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable with Amendments {535864/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 66
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-7) 72
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-101, 9-102, 9-102.1, 9-102.2, 9-102.3, 9-103 through 9-108, 9-104.1, 9-109, 9-110, 9-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM