Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to survey freestanding ambulatory care facilities in accordance with federal regulations, with an exception; requiring the Department to survey each freestanding birthing center at least once per calendar year; requiring the Department to inspect the operations of each home health agency at least every 3 years; altering the frequency from two times to once each year at which the Department must make a site visit and conduct a survey of each licensed nursing home; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
18A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {467476/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {946084/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted 18A
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {467476/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 38
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {946084/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-1408, 19-3B-03, 19-407, 19-705.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM