Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring all health care providers in the State to report all vaccinations to the Maryland immunization registry, ImmuNet; altering specified responsibilities of the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene relating to specified forms and a specified brochure; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
18A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted 18A
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page