Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Klausmeier, Miller, Bates, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing, from $250,000 to $375,000, the amount the Chesapeake Bay Trust is required to receive each fiscal year from the Environmental Trust Fund for funding energy conservation projects through the Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program; requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority, in consultation with the Chesapeake Bay Trust, to report to the General Assembly on the feasibility of establishing a specified donation program for the benefit of the Chesapeake Bay Trust to which E-ZPass account holders may donate; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {370411/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (127-6)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senators Pinsky, Montgomery, and Waugh
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Delegates Holmes, Gilchrist, and O'Donnell
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed 45
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 48
House 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {370411/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Special Order until next session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (127-6) 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senators Pinsky, Montgomery, and Waugh 63
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Refuses to Recede 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Delegates Holmes, Gilchrist, and O'Donnell 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 72
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM