Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Ellis, Feldman, Patterson, Smith, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the duties of the Statewide Steering Committee on Services for Adults with Sickle Cell Disease to include the provision of certain resources for detecting sickle cell disease and supporting individuals with sickle cell disease; authorizing the Maryland Department of Health to provide certain services relating to sickle cell disease in consultation with the Steering Committee; requiring the Department to provide certain services through community-based organizations to the extent practicable; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0761
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {734035/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health - Sickle Cell Disease - Steering Committee, Services, Testing, and Funding (Sickle Cell Treatment Act of 2019)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {734035/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 52
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Text - Chapter - Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-501, 18-506, 18-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM