Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Community Benefit Report - Disclosure of Tax Exemptions
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Benson, Guzzone, Kelley, Madaleno, Pinsky, Ramirez, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a hospital to include an itemization of the value of all tax exemptions the hospital receives in the hospital's community benefit report.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1189
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2016 3/09/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page