Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Zucker, Benson, Guzzone, Jennings, King, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of each institution of higher education, on or before August 1, 2019, to adopt and submit to the Maryland Higher Education Commission a revised written policy on sexual assault that includes certain disciplinary proceedings provisions; requiring the disciplinary proceedings provisions to include a description of the rights for certain students and to include certain provisions; specifying that an institution may not discourage a student from retaining an attorney; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0913
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954632/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {243328/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484665/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Sexual Assault Policy - Disciplinary Proceedings Policy
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {954632/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Conway) Adopted 47
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {243328/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Appropriations 50
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {484665/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Text - Chapter - Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM