Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage - Treatment for Contagious Diseases
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to the limitations of the State budget, to provide coverage for any medically appropriate drug or other treatment for the treatment of a contagious disease that is determined to be necessary by the treating physician; requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for certain drugs or other treatments for the treatment of a contagious disease; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage - Treatment for Contagious Diseases
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-854 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page