Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy to study and review certain issues related to certain changes to forested lands in the State due to certain circumstances; requiring the Task Force to develop findings and recommendations regarding forest conservation in Maryland and to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2018; authorizing the Task Force to consult with the Chesapeake Bay Program, the U.S. Forest Service, and certain governmental entities and academic institutions; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0766
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994034/1
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994034/1
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994034/1
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-29)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {183425/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Bates) Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {823624/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {840312/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-36)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natural Resources - Forest Conservation Act - Standards and Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {994034/1 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Young) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {994034/1 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Young) Adopted 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments {994034/1 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-29) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young) Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {183425/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Bates) Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {823624/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {840312/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (103-36) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page