Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the fee that a homeowners association may impose for a certain inspection from $50 to $100; altering the circumstances under which the homeowners association is entitled to the inspection fee; establishing that a homeowners association shall be composed of all lot owners and that the bylaws may authorize the delegation of any power of the homeowners association; establishing certain powers of a homeowners association; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0709
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11B-106, 11B-106.2, 11B-106.3, 11B-111, 11B-111.8, 11B-112, 11B-112.1, 11B-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM