Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Permits
Sponsored by
Senators Brinkley and Young
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to four the number of gaming events that a specified organization in Frederick County may hold in a calendar year in which the major prize has a value of more than $5,000.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0329
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed 38
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 40
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 43
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM